Sidlow et al v. Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Faith Sidlow and Richard Nitido
Defendant: Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00657
Filed: May 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying Motion to Defer Consideration of Motion 66 , and Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/5/16. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re Request to Seal Documents signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/2/16, ORDERING that the document attached as Exhibit P to Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment be filed under seal. (ECF No. 68, Ex. P.)(Kastilahn, A)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/21/16: Plaintiffs' request to seal Exhibit P to its opposition 69 is hereby denied, and Plaintiffs are instructed to refile their request to seal pursuant to the requirements of Local Rule 141(b) within 14 days of the entry of this Order.(Kaminski, H)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Compel Additional Discovery and VACATING October 28, 2015 Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2015. (Kusamura, W)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 52 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND A PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND VACATING THE AUGUST 5, 2015 HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2015. (Hernandez, M)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/19/2015. (Hernandez, M)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting in Part 40 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/11/2015. (Kusamura, W)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Cancel Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2015. (Hernandez, M)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/8/15 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 8/17/2015. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/15/2015. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 2/11/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 5/19/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 5/12/2016, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. A Jury Trial is SET for 7/18/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial le ngth of five to six (5-6) days. A Settlement Conference is SET for 5/14/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Confidential settlement conference statements to be submitted not later than 5/7/2015 to saborders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Kastilahn, A)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/6/15 GRANTING Defendant's MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' disparate treatment claims with leave to amend 9 . Plaintiffs have 30 days from the date on which this Order is filed to file an amended complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidlow et al v. Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Sidlow
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Represented By: Shelley G. Bryant
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nitido
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Represented By: Shelley G. Bryant
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan Bradley Carp
Represented By: Joshua Alan Kuns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?