Estrada v. Biter
Petitioner: Jaime Estrada
Respondent: Martin Biter
Case Number: 1:2014cv00679
Filed: May 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Petitioner's ineffective assistance of counsel claim be DENIED and that the petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jaime Estrada ; referred to Judge DROZD,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/15/17. Objections to F&R due by 9/18/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying Respondent's 68 Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/24/2017. (Flores, E)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Regarding Petitioner's Failure to File Response to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/17/17: 4/19/17 Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER following Pre-Hearing Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/21/2017. (Filing Deadline set for 5/3/2017 for parties to file Witness and Exhibit Lists.) (Lundstrom, T)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 58 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/17. Filing Deadline: 3/14/2017. Pre-Hearing Conference set for 3/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Marrujo, C)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Following Scheduling Conference Re: Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/17: Pre-Hearing Conference set for March 14, 2017 at 9:30 AM; Joint Pre-Hearing Statement due March 7, 2017; Evidentiary Hearing set for May 5, 2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hellings, J)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/18/17: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Adopting 48 Findings and Recommendation, Denying In Part Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Evidentiary Hearing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/17/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that an Evidentiary hearing be held on Petitioner's First Claim for Relief; Remaining Claims for Relief in the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jaime Estrada ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/19/2016. Objections to F&R due (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CJA 20 APPOINTING ATTORNEY Carolyn D. Phillips for Jaime Estrada, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/26/2015, Nunc Pro Tunc 6/24/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPOINTING Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/15. (cc: Federal Defender's Office) (Marrujo, C)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Adopting 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION; ORDER DENYING Respondent's 14 Motion to Dismiss, DENYING Petitioner's 9 Motion for Discovery, DISMISSING Petitioner's 15 Motion to Lift Stay signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/19/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/13/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/19/14. (Verduzco, M)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 19 Motion to File Surreply, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?