Russell v. Foulk
Petitioner: Michael Demond Russell
Respondent: Fredric Foulk
Case Number: 1:2014cv00685
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment in Favor of Respondent, and DECLINING to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/11/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Petitioner's Motion to Amend to Name a Proper Respondent; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Substitute Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/23/14. (Verduzco, M)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Petitioner Leave to File Motion to Amend to Name a Proper Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/27/14. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-1105 AC) to Fresno (1:14-cv-685 GSA) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/7/14. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Demond Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fredric Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?