Campbell v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrone Campbell, Sr.
Defendant: Jeffery Beard, J. A. Zamora, P. D. Brazelton, J. Buckley, R. Fisher, Jr., D. B. Allen, J. Morgan, J. Herrera, C. Nevarez, J. Mendez, D. Aguinaga, D. Cardenas, T. Ramos, M. Barajas and A. Salas
Case Number: 1:2014cv00801
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Third-Party Witness to Attend Deposition by Telephone signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/14/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Defendants' 46 Request to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines Following Final Resolution of their Motion for Summary Judgment Relating to Exhaution, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/15. (Verduzco, M)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 39 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT relating to exhaustion of the administrative remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/7/2015.(Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second 37 Motion to Extend the Deadline to File an Exhaustion Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2015. Exhaustion Motion Deadline: August 27, 2015. (Marrujo, C)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 35 Request to Extend the Deadline to File an Exhaustion Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/06/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Excessive Force Claim Against Defendants Mendez, Aguinaga, Ramos, and Cardenas, DISMISSING All Other Claims and Defendants, and REFERRING Mat ter Back to Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/27/2014. Jeffery Beard, P. D. Brazelton, J. Buckley, R. Fisher, Jr., J. Herrera, J. Morgan, C. Nevarez, A. Salas, J. A. Zamora, D. B. Allen and M. Barajas terminated. (Jessen, A)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING ACTION PROCEED ON EXCESSIVE FORCE CLAIM ONLY AND ALL OTHER CLAIMS BE DISMISSED FROM THE ACTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A COGNIZABLE CLAIM FOR RELIEF re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J O'Neil; Objections to F&R due by 10/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/18/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Request for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/11/2014. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrone Campbell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. A. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. D. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nevarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Aguinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?