Campos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ausencio Campos
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv00802
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Awarding Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) and Cost Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920 (re Doc. 23 Stipulation). Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees under the EqualAccess to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412, in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND ELEVEN HUNDRED FIFTEEN dollars and 78/100 cents ($5,115.78). Defendant shall consider any assignment of EAJA fees under the conditions agreed to the in parties stipulation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2015. (Herman, H)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Reversing Agency's Denial of Benefits and Ordering Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation and Order for a second extension of time to Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/22/2015. (Response due by 6/2/2015) (Rosales, O)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time: Defendant's first request for an extension of time, by 4/18/2015, to respond to Plaintiff's motion. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/31/2015. (Herman, H)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule (re Doc. 12 Stipulation): Plaintiff shall have an extension to February 27, 2015 to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2015. (Herman, H)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/2/14. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ausencio Campos
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kevin Gill, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?