Furnace v. Gipson et al
Plaintiff: Edward T Furnace
Defendant: Connie Gipson, M.S. Robicheaux and M. Sexton
Case Number: 1:2014cv00814
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION and Closing Case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/10/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER EXTENDING Date for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Extending Date for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/13/2017. (Case Management Deadline: 4/3/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER EXTENDING Date for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/31/2017. Defendants' responses due by 3/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 68 Motion to Strike Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/2016. (Flores, E)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING 63 Findings and Recommendation to: (1) Grant Defendants' 51 Motion to Dismiss; and (2) GRANT Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Amend; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Respond to Third Amended Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/17/16. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to File Third Amended Complaint;FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 51 be GRANTED; Plainitff's Motion to Amend 57 be GRANTED; Plaintiff to proceed on Third Amended Complaint ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/20/2016. Objections to F&R due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/16. Twenty One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING Order Directing Payment Of Inmate Filing Fee By California Department Of Corrections (ECF No. 5 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/16/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS: 1) For Service of Cognizable First Amendment Claims, and 2) to Dismiss Remaining Claims With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/3/15, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Motion for Clarification 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/15. 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 8 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furnace v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S. Robicheaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T Furnace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?