D.L. v. Vassilev et al
Plaintiff: D.L.
Defendant: Margaret Vassilev, M.D., Rodolfo Vicente, M.D., Mark Wiseman, M.D., Pavel Mundl, M.D., County of Tulare, Kaweah Delta Healthcare District, Sandra Bosman, M.D., Lori Ann M. Boken, M.D., T. Plunkett, RNC, D. Brackett, RNC, B. Brown, RNFA, Christopher Bencomo, M.D. and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2014cv00824
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND ORDER THEREON, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/15/2019. REMANDING CASE to Tulare County Superior Court 640 S Alta Ave, Dinuba, CA 93618, CASE NO. 246425. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED, Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 29) is modified as follows: a) Initial expert disclosures shall be completed by July 12, 2019; b) Supplemental expert disclosures shall be completed by July 26, 2019; c) Expert discovery shall be completed by August 23, 2019; and d) Dispositive motions shall be served and filed by August 30, 2019. The pretrial conference remains set for November 5, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 bef ore the honorable Barbara A. McAuliffe, United States Magistrate Judge. The trial date likewise remains set for February 4, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. before Judge McAuliffe. The parties are cautioned that further modifications of the scheduling conference order will not be granted absent a showing of good cause. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/10/2019. (Timken, A)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 APPLICATION AND STIPULATION FOR ORDER continuing Discovery Deadlines and ORDER THEREON signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/29/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Defendants Pavel Mundl, MD and Rodolfo Vicente, MD, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PLUNKETT, BRACKETT, AND BROWN, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/22/2018. (Kusamura, W)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER VACATING Hearing and ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 42 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/14/2017. Kaweah Delta Healthcare District terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT re 9 and REMANDING CASE to Superior Court of Tulare County signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/20/2015. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Judge McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2014. (Herman, H)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER vacating hearing date of August 4, 2014 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/14. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.L. v. Vassilev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.L.
Represented By: Mark Wade Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Vassilev, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Vicente, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wiseman, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavel Mundl, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tulare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaweah Delta Healthcare District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Bosman, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Ann M. Boken, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Plunkett, RNC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Brackett, RNC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Brown, RNFA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bencomo, M.D.
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?