Wiseman v. Cate, et al.
Plaintiff: Chester Ray Wiseman
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Martin D. Biter, S. Lopez, Chung-Kwang Chen and Ameen Manasrah
Case Number: 1:2014cv00831
Filed: June 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER After Notice of all parties acceptance of Mediator's proposal signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/12/2019. Dispositional Documents due by 5/3/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 81 Defendants' Motion to Stay the Case Pending Appeal of Denial of Qualified Immunity signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DECLINING IN PART to Adopt 55 Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/25/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING 73 Defendants' Request to Screen Fourth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2016 recommending that 71 MOTION for injunctive relief be denied. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 1/23/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2016 recommending that 64 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/28/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER vacating February 19, 2016 Order and denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion for court order to return legal papers re 60 , 61 , 62 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order to Return Legal Papers, Filed February 17, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motions To Dismiss And Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File A Third Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. [27, 36 , 40 , 42 , 44 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 1/11/2016. (Fahrney, E)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 17 , 26 Motions for Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/9/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Orders 17 , 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/23/15: Thirty-Day Deadline for Objections. (Hellings, J)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Lodged March 16, 2015 and GRANTING Defendant Biter Thirty Days from the Date of Service of this Order to File a Response signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/17/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Finding Plaintiff States a Cognizable Claim of Deliberate Indifference Against Defendant Biter Only, and DISMISSING All Other Claims and Defendants From This Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief 1 , 8 , 9 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/18/14: This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for intitiation of service of process. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiseman v. Cate, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Ray Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin D. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chung-Kwang Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameen Manasrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?