Weatherington v. Rios et al
Plaintiff: Monte Weatherington
Defendant: S. Rios and M. Arranquin
Case Number: 1:2014cv00906
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Case, with Prejudice, For Failure to State a Claim; ORDER that this Dismissal is Subject to 28 U.S.C.1915(g); ORDER for Clerk to Close Case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/08/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED With Prejudice Based on Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted Under Section 1983 re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/20/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/1/2016 recommending that action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Amend as Unnecessary and Directing Clerk's Office to Amend Docket to Reflect Filing of Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/15. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherington v. Rios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Weatherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Arranquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?