McClure v. Chen, et al.
Plaintiff: George McClure
Defendant: C. K. Chen and L. D. Zamora
Case Number: 1:2014cv00932
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ADOPTING 105 Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING 100 Plaintiff's Motion to Void the Settlement Agreement signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/25/2020. (Jessen, A)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Void the Settlement Agreement, filed on June 24, 2019 100 , be Denied ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2020. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER directing Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Void the Settlement Agreement 100 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/10/2020. (Response due within seven (7) Days.) (Lundstrom, T)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Giving Full Effect to Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal and ORDER DISMISSING CASE Under Rule 41, With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that Inmate is no Longer Needed as Participant in Settlement Conference, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to dismiss Defendant, Horton and all claims against him, under Rule 41, with prejudice re 83 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/20/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's 88 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/2/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/20/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS TESTIFICANDUM for George McClure, CDCR# V-00733 on June 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m., Fresno, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/1/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 86 Motion for a Telephonic Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/15/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/22/19. (Settlement Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 77 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions; ORDER for Plaintiff to Provide Amended Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories Nos. 3,4,5, and 6 and Defendants' Request for Production of Documents within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/18/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to extend Discovery Deadline for limited purpose 75 ; New Deadline for Defendants to file Motion to Compel: January 28, 2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING 73 Motion to Appoint Counsel to Assist Plaintiff at Deposition, or in the Alternative, to Allow Inmate Parthemore to Attend Deposition and Assist Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 71 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/11/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER LIFTING STAY of Discovery; New Discovery and Scheduling ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/13/2018. New Discovery Deadline: January 14, 2019; New Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline: March 14, 2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DECLINING to Adopt 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Second 47 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER VACATING 47 Motion for Summary Judgment From Court's Calendar signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/15/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' Second 47 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/19/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 2/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER striking surreply 56 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/31/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DECLINING to Adopt 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; DENYING Defendants' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 28 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/21/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Defendants' 31 Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Exhaustion Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/11/16. (Gonzalez, R)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 25 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order ; ORDERED that existing initial disclosure deadline is VACATED pending a ruling on Defendants' anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/19/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/24/15: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-1355 CMK PC) to Fresno (1:14-cv-0932 SKO PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/17/2014. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Chen, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. K. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?