Solis v. County of Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: Javier Solis
Defendant: County of Stanislaus, Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department, Ceres Police Department, Officer Perry and Quiroz
Case Number: 1:2014cv00937
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Stipulation and ORDER for DISMISSAL by Operation of Law, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/17. CASE CLOSED.(Marrujo, C)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Defendants Albonetti and King for Failure to Effectuate Service of Process, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/21/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Defendants Albonetti and King for Failure to Effectutate Service of Process, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/3/16. Referred to Judge Drozd; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/22/16. Deadline to Amend Pleadings: August 22, 2016, Discovery Deadline: December 22, 2016, Dispositive Motion Deadline: February 22, 2017. (Verduzco, M)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS, ALBONETTI AND KING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE SUFFICIENT INFORMATION TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/22/2016. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2016.(Lundstrom, T)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing Service By The United States Marshal Without Prepayment Of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/7/2016. (Filing Deadline: 1/20/2016) (Fahrney, E)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/26/2015 ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendations; ORDERING that this action proceed on 11 Third Amended Complaint against Defendants Griebel and Quiroz, in their individual capacities, for exces sive force in violation of the Fourth Amendment and against Defendants Niewenhuis, King and Albonetti, in their individual capacities, for failure to intercede; DISMISSING the plaintiff's claims against said defendants in their official capacities; GRANTING the plaintiff thirty days to file a Fourth Amended Complaint joining the City of Ceres as a defendant. (Michel, G.)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign a District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants re 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/2/15. This Case is Assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The New Case Number is: 1:14-cv-00937-WBS-BAM. Fourteen-Day Deadline. Referred to Judge Shubb.(Gonzalez, R)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER Dismissing 9 Second Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/15. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER Dismissing First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/14. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Screening ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF No. 1). Thirty days plaintiff shall file first amended complaint. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/10/2014. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceres Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?