Jaimes v. Barnes et al

Plaintiff: Juan Jaimes
Defendant: Robert J. Barnes, J. Akanno, S. Schaefer, S. Lopez, I. Patel, Neighbors, Kauffman, Finnigan, S. Tallerico, H. Sierra, E. Borrero, S. Hennis and B. Da Veiga
Case Number: 1:2014cv00952
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, 109 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Incarcerated Witnesses and Pretrial Statement, Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement, and Denying Plaintiff's Second Request for Appointment of Counsel re 104 , 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 12, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 83 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate, Juan Jaimes signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 2, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Relieving Defendant Dr. Barnes from Participation in Settlement Conference on June 9, 2017, In Light of Grant of Motion for Summary Judgment re 88 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/1/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Juan Jaimes, CDCR #V-08644 to Corcoran State Prison on 06/09/2017 at 8:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/4/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 19, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/19/2017 recommending that 72 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be granted. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/22/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 13, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DENYING Defendant Barnes' 68 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice for failure to provide RAND Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/2016. (7-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 5, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Barnes' 66 Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice for Failure to Provide Rand Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/04/2016. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Defendants to Provide Further Information in Regard to 63 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Dispositive Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/16. 5-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
August 3, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING Deposition Deadline to September 5, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/3/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 35 36 Motions for Summary Judgment for Lack of Exhaustion of the Administrative Remedies signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/2/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 Defendants' Request to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/3/2016. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 35 & 36 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART re 21 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/22/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant Barnes' 54 Request to Accept Reply Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
May 3, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 51 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and VACATING Deposition Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/3/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Robert J. Barnes signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/24/2015. (Flores, E)
June 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Service of Process is Appropriate on Plaintiff's Claim of Deliberate Indifference Against Defendants Barnes, Neighbors, Finnigan and Kauffman, DISMISSING All Other Claims and Defendants, and Referring the Matter Back to the Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/29/2015. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Complaint; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2014. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaimes v. Barnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jaimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Akanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tallerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Borrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Da Veiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?