Cranford v. King et al
Plaintiff: Archie Cranford
Defendant: Audrey King, Brandon Price and Cliff Allenby
Case Number: 1:2014cv01002
Filed: June 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION With Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/13/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/12/2015. Show Cause Response due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISCHARGING 11 Order to Show Cause and Extending Time to File Amended Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/11/2014. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/31/14: Fourteen (14) Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Default Judgment, without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/23/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 6 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/12/2014. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranford v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Cranford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Allenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?