Dowling v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Brenda D. Dowling
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association and BAC Home Loans Servicing
Case Number: 1:2014cv01041
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER requiring parties to file dispositional documents and vacating all dates and matters in this action 125 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2018. (Filing Deadline: 3/12/2018).(Lundstrom, T)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/17/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TENTATIVE PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/20/2017. (Each party is granted 14 days from the date of this order to file objections to the same. Each party is also granted 7 days thereafter to respond to the other party's objections. If no objections are filed, the order will become final without further order of this court.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE requiring Plaintiff's personal appearance on 9/26/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd and directing Clerk of Court to serve this order on Plaintiff, Brenda D. Dowling2906 N. Vagedes Ave. Fresno, CA 93705 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/1/2017 granting Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 61 . (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying 57 Motion for Leave to Amend, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/17/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re Stipulation (Doc. 59) Request to Continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference to May 23, 2017: (1.) The current mandatory settlement conference scheduled for April 11, 2017 in this matter shall be continued until May 23, 2017, at 9: 30 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; and (2.) No later than seven days prior to the settlement conference, each party shall submit directly to Judge McAuliffes chambers at bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement conference statement. This statement should neither be filed with the Clerk of the Court nor served on any other party. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/7/2017. (Herman, H)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for April 11, 2017 at 9:30 am before Judge McAuliffe). PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/22/2016. (Herman, H)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO PERMIT 50 INTERROGATORIES. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties may submit 50 interrogatories in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 6/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2016. (Hernandez, M)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Requiring Defendant to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should not Issue for Failure to Appear, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/2016. (Kusamura, W)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Adopting 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2016. (1. The 38 findings and recommendations filed March 16, 2016, are adopted; 2. Defendants' 29 motion for relief from entry of default filed August 21, 2015, is granted; and 3. Defendants shall file an answer to the amended complaint within ten days from the date this order is docketed.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ENTRY OF DEFAULT. OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN 14 DAYS. The matter is referred to Judge Drozd; Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/28/2015 ORDERING that Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second, Sixth, and Seventh claims is DENIED. Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, and Fifth claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date on which this Order is filed to file an Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading within 21 days of service of the Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowling v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda D. Dowling
Represented By: John Neal Drooyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?