Gutierrez v. Nunez et al
Plaintiff: Natividad Gutierrez
Defendant: Manuel Nunez, Aracely Nunez and Avtar Kaur Sohal
Case Number: 1:2014cv01066
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Stipulation for Dismissal of Action; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/27/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Amended Joint Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Dispositional Documents; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/2015. Plaintiff shall file dispositional documents in this case not later than March 26, 2015.(Martinez, A)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/7/2015. (Martinez, A)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Augustin Orozco Only; ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant Augustin Orozco From the Docket re 19 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/26/2014. (Martinez, A)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulation granting Plaintiff leave to file first amended complaint; Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2014. (First Amended Complaint Deadline: 10/23/2014) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natividad Gutierrez
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aracely Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avtar Kaur Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?