Frazier v. Montgomery

Petitioner: Semaj Leon Frazier
Respondent: W. L. Montgomery
Case Number: 1:2014cv01146
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 48 Motion to Reopen Case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/11/2017. (Flores, E)
April 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Disregarding 16 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/15. (Verduzco, M)
August 1, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's 3 Motion to Stay Proceedings; ORDER for Petitioner to File Regular Status Reports signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/01/2014. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Semaj Leon Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?