Hearns v. Gonzales
Plaintiff: Jamar R. Hearns
Defendant: R. Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2014cv01177
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING 93 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/6/18. (Marrujo, C)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER VACATING 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS; CORRECTED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/19/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismiss Action for Lack of Exhaustion, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/15/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen. (Marrujo, C)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 72 Request for Telephonic Appearance, Appointment of Counsel, and Change of Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/25/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 63 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order as to Dispositive Motion Deadline; Dispositive Motion Deadline STAYED until Thirty (30) Days after the District Judge Decides Defendants' Exhaustion Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/13/17. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/26/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Gonzalez, R)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Adopting 49 Findings and Recommendations and Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 38 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing; Case to Remain Open, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/9/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Adopting 50 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/9/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 60 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/31/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Continue Deposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/17/16. (Verduzco, M)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 52 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/5/16: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/15/16: 14-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Surreply 46 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 38 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and Set Case for Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/7/16. 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/31/16: Motion is DENIED as Moot. (Hellings, J)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (1) VACATING 25 Finding and Recommendations Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend; (2) DEEMING 19 Third Amended Complaint Amended to Substitute Correctional Sergeant Olsen in Place of Doe 1 as Defendant; and (3) DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Amend Court Records to Reflect Substitution, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/14/15. (Marrujo, C)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: 1) Grant 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Fourth Amended Complaint and 2) Vacate 20 Findings and Recommendations for Service of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/28/15. Objections Due within Fourteen Days. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Proceed with Service of Plaintiff's Cognizable Claims and to Dismiss Remaining Claims with Prejudice 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/4/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearns v. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar R. Hearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gonzales
Represented By: Ellen Y. Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?