Hypolite v. Zariora et al
Plaintiff: Avery L. Hypolite
Defendant: R. Zamora and N. Schultz
Case Number: 1:2014cv01199
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Bill of Costs Taxed Against Him signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/31/2018. (Jessen, A)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER That Inmate Jesse Washington is No Longer Needed as a Witness in There Proceedings, and The Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/17.(Hellings, J)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND PRETRIAL ORDER AND WITNESS LIST (Doc. 106) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 18, 2017. (Munoz, I)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER OVERRULING 97 Defendant's Objection to the Court's May 5, 2017, Order Granting Attendance of Inmate Witnesses signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/8/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness Jesse Washington, CDCR# D-23593, for Jury Trial on May 23, 2017 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/05/2017. (Flores, E)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Order Directing the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Allow Inmate Witness to Appear in Prison Khakis During Trial signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/02/2017. (Flores, E)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Regarding Defendant's 83 Objections to Pretrial Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/25/2017. (Flores, E)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Further Documentation as to his Request for Inmate Witnesses signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/24/2017. (Flores, E)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ninth Motion for Appointment of Counsel 76 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISCHARGING 67 Order to Show Cause Issued February 23, 2017, and Directing Defendant to File the Pretrial Statement and Opposition, If Any, to Plaintiff's Motion for Incarcerated Witnesses Within Fifteen Days of Date of Service of This Order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/7/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Within Fifteen Days Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Failure to Comply With the Court's Scheduling Order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/23/17. (Marrujo, C)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 63 , 64 , Motions for Reconsideration of the Court's August 17, 2016, Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Eighth 61 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, 54 Plaintiff's Seventh Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/1/2016. (Jessen, A)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Compel, and Directing Plaintiff to File a Response and Produce Documents Within Thirty Days From the Date of Service fo This Order 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/20/16. (Hellings, J)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/27/2016. (Flores, E)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/17/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for Appointment of Counsel 39 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/16: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 28 Findings and Recommendation, Dismissing Defendant Schultz, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(M) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; N. Schultz (Correctional Officer) terminated, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/11/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Plainitiff's Fourth 33 Motion for Appoint Counsel, without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/11/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Compel ;ORDERED that in the interest of justice, the Court will grant Plaintiff thirty additional days from the date of service of this order to provide additional information, if possible, to assist in the identification of Defendant Schultz, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/8/2015. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's THIRD Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 26 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/10/2015. (Fahrney, E)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/17/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/1/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hypolite v. Zariora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery L. Hypolite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?