Trujillo v. Munoz
Plaintiff: Guillermo Cruz Trujillo
Defendant: Munoz
Case Number: 1:2014cv01215
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 53 Motion to supplement the complaint and granting Defendants' additional time to file a responsive pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER adopting 44 Findings and Recommendations, dismissing certain claims and defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Put Hold on Case; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/25/18. 60 Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed, with prejudice, for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim for which relief may be granted re 20 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint ; referred to Judge Ishii; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to Assign a District Judge to this action; New Case Number is 1:14-cv-01215 AWI-SAB (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/18. Objections to F&R due by 9/10/2018(Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING This Action for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Could be Granted; ORDER That This Action Count as a Strike Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/16. CASE CLOSED (Strike). (Marrujo, C)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 14 Motion to Proceed with Discovery and Schedule Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/18/15. (Verduzco, M)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying 12 Motion for the Presentation of Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/02/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Cruz Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?