Marques Butler v. Brazelton et al
Plaintiff: Marques Butler
Defendant: P.D. Brazelton, M.D. Dotson, R. Boozer, R. Redding, S. Espino, Davi, P. Martinez, E. Villegas, Morelock and J. Morgan
Case Number: 1:2014cv01220
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/13/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISCHARGING 53 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Marques Butler, CDCR#AC-0431 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING in its entirety, Request for Reconsideration 50 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/05/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Marques Butler, CDCR #AC-0431 to Corcoran State Prison on June 9, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/4/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Appointing Counsel; Chijioke O. Ikonte added for Marques Butler, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/1/17. (Martin-Gill, S)(Copy of this order sent to Sujean Park and Marques Butler)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Marques Butler, CDCR# AC-0431, for Evidentiary Hearing on June 16, 2017 at 12:30 p.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/24/2017. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/21/17:Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/16/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER setting hearing on 17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/22/2017. (Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean).(Lundstrom, T)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REQUIRING Initial Disclosures and SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/23/17. 30-Day Deadline for Initial Disclosures; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Marrujo, C)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' 17 Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/10/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marques Butler v. Brazelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marques Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Boozer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Espino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?