General Fidelity Insurance Company v. Quanta Specialty Lines Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: General Fidelity Insurance Company
Defendant: Quanta Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Bella Vista Estates, Laurel Tree Homes, Inc., David Dyck, Lambeth Construction of California, Inc., Lambeth Construction, Inc., Rene Diaz, Monica Diaz, David Beltran and Alma Beltran
Case Number: 1:2014cv01325
Filed: August 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/8/2017 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/16 ORDERING that defendant David Dyck is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/22/2015 DENYING 88 and 89 Motions for Leave to File Amended Pleadings. (Zignago, K.)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/14/2015 AMENDING the 85 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order; ORDERING the parties to make expert witness disclosures under F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(2) by 11/10/2015 and to make supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal experts under F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(2)(c) by 11/17/2015. (Michel, G.)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/10/2015 ORDERING 80 that the parties herein have until 2/27/2015 to submit their Joint Status Report.(Reader, L)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER 41 re Dismissal of certain homeowner defendants signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/17/2014. All amended homeowner defendants with the exception of Rene Diaz, Monica Diaz, David Beltran, and Alma Beltran are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff GFIC and dismissed Homeowner Defendants shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Fidelity Insurance Company v. Quanta Specialty Lines Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Fidelity Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Wayne Keaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanta Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Vista Estates
Represented By: Jeffrey Leonard Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Tree Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Leonard Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambeth Construction of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambeth Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?