Martinez Castro v. Unnamed Defendants
Plaintiff: Glenn S. Martinez Castro
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants
Case Number: 1:2014cv01326
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute and For Violation of Local Rules; ORDER REGARDING Defendant's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for the failure to exhaust administrative remedies, filed May 5, 2016 51 be GRANTED ;referred to Judge Ishii; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 55 MOTION to STAY filed by Glenn S. Martinez Castro, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/23/17. (Objections to F&R due : 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 49 Request for Deposition Subpoena; ORDER Denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/12/2016. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 41 Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/16/2016. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 38 Motion for the Issuance of Subpoenas signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/29/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 27 Motion to Resubmit Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/21/15. (Marrujo, C)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Include Names for His Doe Defendants in the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/30/2014. Thirty Day Deadline to File Complaint. (Marrujo, C)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/28/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Castro v. Unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn S. Martinez Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?