J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Bailey
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Mark Thomas Bailey
Case Number: 1:2014cv01353
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendant Mark Thomas Bailey, Individually and d/b/a Madd Baileys signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 Extension of Time to File the Dismissal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/6/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 9/29/2017. (Hall, S)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AFTER 37 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/3/2017. Stipulated Dismissal due by 9/1/2017. All other pending dates, hearings and conferences are VACATED. (Hall, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2017. Settlement Conference set for 8/7/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/6/2017. (The parties to show cause in writing by Monday, April 3, 2017 regarding why sanctions should not be imposed due to their failure to file renewed motions for summary judgment.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Both Parties' 13 14 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice and Reopening Discovery, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/9/2016. (Discovery is reopened, to be completed by 1/17/2017; Renewed motions for s ummary judgment may be filed on or before 2/7/2017 and noticed for hearing in keeping with the Local Rules of this court; and Final Pretrial Conference and Trial dates will be scheduled following the close of the re-opened law and motion period if necessary.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Cross Motions For Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2016. (The hearing on the 13 14 cross-motions for summary judgment currently set for May 17, 2016, is continued to June 21, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.)(Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thomas Bailey
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?