Trujillo v. Biter
Plaintiff: Guillermo Cruz Trujillo
Defendant: Biter
Case Number: 1:2014cv01370
Filed: September 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Denying 129 Request for Copy of all Docketed Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/20/2019. (Flores, E)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Case be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One Days; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request to File Additional Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Sant Agata, S)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE and ORDER That Inmate Witness is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings, and That the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged 109 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Guillermo Cruz Trujillo on June 29, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing and Related Deadlines 99 & 102 ; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of This Order and a Copy of the Telephonic Status Conference Minutes to Plaintiff at Pelican Bay State Prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/24/2018: Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Plaintiff's Motion for Attendance due 5/11/2018; Defendants' Response due 5/18/2018; Witness Lists & Exhibit Lists due 6/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 81 , 82 & 94 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/2018: 21-Day Deadline; and This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 1 17 , 19 & 89 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/5/2018: All claims and defendants, except for Plaintiff's claims against Officers Gomez, Juarez, and Fernandez for excessive force in violation of the Eighth Amendment, be DISMISSED. (Hellings, J)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Findings and Recommendations 93 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/15/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied 81 & 82 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/13/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/12/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Squash Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Exhaustion 79 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/6/17. (Hellings, J)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER After Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 58 , 65 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/17: This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Marshal's Request for Reimbursement of Costs for Service 68 , 69 & 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/22/17: Defendant Juarez is to pay the Marshal $64.21; and The Marshal is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendant Juarez by mail to the address that the Marshal sent the request for waiver of service to. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/21/2017 recommending that 58 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security Under Local Rule 151(b) be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to File Exhibits 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/27/17: The Clerk of Court is directed to send the exhibits back to Plaintiff. (Hellings, J)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Defendants Fernandez and Gomez's 40 Motion to Consolidate Pleadings and Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/23/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Court Order Allowing Limited Discovery 28 , 29 ; ORDER for Office of the Attorney General to Address Response to Service on Defendant Juarez, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/22/16. Service Documents Deadline: 60-Days. (cc: Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson). (Verduzco, M)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion for the Denial of Plaintiff's Due Process Rights, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/16. (Gonzalez, R)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FINDING COGNIZABLE CLAIMS and DISMISSING OTHERS; ORDER for Plaintiff to Either: (1) NOTIFY the Court that he is Willing to Proceed only on the Claims Found Cognizable by the Court and for Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment by Gomez, Juarez and Fernandez; or (2) Notify the Court that he Does Not wish to Proceed on these Claims; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONSTRUING Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as a Motion to Amend and Amended Complaint 13 ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/20/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Presentation of Exhibits, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/11/15. (Verduzco, M)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSTRUING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend as First Amended Complaint 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/15: The Complaint will be screened in due course. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Cruz Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?