Anderson v. Krpan et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Anderson
Defendant: Chris Krpan and Michael Foster
Case Number: 1:2014cv01380
Filed: September 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendant's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/25/2019. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/11/2019. (Flores, E)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying 68 Motion for Appointment of Medical Expert signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/24/2019. (Flores, E)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying Defendants' 55 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 01/11/2018. (Flores, E)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Civil Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/10/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING U.S. Marshals' Request for Reimbursement of Costs of Serving Defendant Krpan signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Providing Defendant Krpan Opportunity to Show Good Cause for Failing to Waive Service signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/26/2017. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING United States Marshals Service to Re-Attempt Service on Defendant Krpan without Prepayment of Costs; Clerk to Provide Defendant's Address to USM, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/10/17. (10-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim re 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/09/15. Referred to Judge Ishii. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Regarding First Amended Complaint 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/10/15: Fourteen (14) Day Response Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint 11 , 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/31/14: Thirty (30)Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/10/14: Fourteen (14) Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Krpan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Krpan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?