Kindred v. Allenby et al
Plaintiff: Richard S. Kindred
Defendant: Cliff Allenby, California Department of State Hospitals, Audrey King, Remi Smith, Mathew Collins, Jeanette Rivera, Angela Padilla, Guadalupa McKenzie, Kenneth Underwood, Marisa Bigot, Paul Alkehougie, Cynthia Martinez, Angel Felix, Jose Lopez, Edward Tongwa, Jorge Zavala, Kenneth Bell, Tom Faina, Daniel Wagoner, Jeffery Hasson and Doug Veit
Case Number: 1:2014cv01652
Filed: October 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Court Grant Defendants' 120 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/23/2019. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due in 14 Days. (Sant Agata, S)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING 93 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/23/2018. (Jessen, A)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER VACATING 84 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Motion for Permission to File Addendum to Complaint; ORDER DENYING 90 Motion Requesting a Telephonic Conference With the Magistrate Judge and Defendants; ORDER GRANTING 73 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Permission to File an Addendum; and ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline to 6/30/2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/18/2018. (Jessen, A)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER ADOPTING 83 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/14/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Provide Status Update; Deadline: April 26, 2018, 4:30 p.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/12/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 62 Motion for waiver of fees for legal copies and cost of postage signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING without Prejudice Plaintiff's 64 Motion to Exclude Evidence; ORDER DENYING without Prejudice Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Appear in Civilian Clothing, Appear without Restraints and be Transported Separate from Penal Detainees signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/22/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 58 Request for Reporter's Transcript at Government Expense signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/16/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER following in camera review re 52 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 46 Motion for permission to appeal to the Ninth Circuit; construing Motion as Notice of Appeal and directing Clerk of Court to process 46 as a Notice of Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Adopting 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to (1) DENY Defendants' Motions to Strike and (2) Deny Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 31 & 40 Defendants' Motions to Strike be DENIED and that 18 & 34 Plaintiff's Motions for Injunctive Relief be DENIED re 15 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/20/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDING AND RECOMMENDATIONS (1) FOR SERVICE OF COGNIZABLE FIRST AMENDMENT CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS BELL AND BIGOT AND (2) TO DISMISS ALL OTHER CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS re 15 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/15/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/2/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kindred v. Allenby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S. Kindred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Allenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of State Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remi Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupa McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Bigot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Alkehougie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Tongwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Faina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Veit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?