Bradford v. Marchak

Plaintiff: Raymond Alford Bradford
Defendant: M. Marchak
Case Number: 1:2014cv01689
Filed: October 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff 326 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/18/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 331 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome of Extraordinary Writ of Mandamus, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Motion for Access to Legal Property and Legal Supplies and Request for Copies of Docket Sheet,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/31/18. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Due: July 13, 2018. (Marrujo, C)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order 323 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/17/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 319 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel to Assist Plaintiff with Deposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/9/18. (Gonzalez, R)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(C) 316 ; ORDER REQUIRING Response From Defendants Within Fourteen (14) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/4/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 288, 289, 292, 293) and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF No. 291), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/24/2018: Plaintiff's motions to strike (Docs. 298 , 299 ) are denied. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Court's April 2, 2018 Order Denying Motions to Strike 296 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/23/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions to Strike 288 , 289 , 292 , 293 and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 291 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/17/2018: Motions are DENIED. (Hellings, J)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Motions and the Parties Motions Concerning Discovery 43 , 44 , 53 , 55 , 57 , 61 , 72 , 74 , 79 , 81 , 82 , 85 , 90 , 92 , 96 , 97 , 104 , 105 , 108 , 119 , 126 , 131 , 132 , 133 , 135 , 136 , 144 , 149 , 157 , 170 , 188 , 189 , 195 , 196 , 197 , 198 , 200 , 201 , 204 , 205 , 208 , 209 , 210 , 222 , 228 , 229 , 230 , 234 , 241 , 247 , 255 , 257 , 258 , 259 , 260 , 269 , 270 , 271 , 272 , 273 , 274 , 275 , 276 , 277 , 285 , 286 ; ORDER Amending Discovery and Scheduling Order; ORDER Admonishing Plaintiff Re Numerous Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Plaintiff's Requests for a Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/02/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/20/2018. (Flores, E)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/2/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Due Process Claims 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/29/2018: Defendant Grewal's answer to the second amended complaint is due within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this order. (Hellings, J)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fourth 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/30/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for the Appointment of Counsel 16 , 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/17/17. (Hellings, J)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying Motion For Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis And Dismissing Action Without Prejudice To Refiling With Submission Of $400.00 Filing Fee (ECF No. 1 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/4/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Marchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Alford Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Marchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?