Hurtado v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pablo Hurtado
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01706
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close this Action Pursuant to Plaintiff's Rule 41(a) Request signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/09/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISCHARGING 7 Order to Show Cause Dated January 29, 2015; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/17/2015. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/13/2015. (Hall, S)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply With the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2015. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/23/2014. (Hall, S)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/5/2014. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurtado v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?