Perez v. Padilla
Plaintiff: Joseph Perez
Defendant: R. Padilla
Case Number: 1:2014cv01730
Filed: November 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case 82 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/13/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause and VACATING Status Conference. The order to show cause is DISCHARGED. By no later than February 26, 2018, the parties shall file dispositional documents requesting the dismissal of the action du e to a settlement. All other deadlines and hearings, including the telephonic status conference set for February 8, 2018, are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/5/2018. (Timken, A)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference and to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Issue for Failure to Comply with the Order re: Settlement Conference, (Doc. 74). ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. 1)The settlement conference set for Febru ary 8, 2018, is VACATED; 2) A telephonic status conference is set before the undersigned for February 8, 2018, at 10:00 A.M. The parties shall call (888) 557-8511, access code 6208204# at the scheduled time. 3) At the conference, the parties shall discuss the prospects of settlement, proposed dates for re-setting the settlement conference, and show cause why sanctions should not issue for failure to comply with the Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/2/2018. (Timken, A)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 71 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2018: This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/12/2017. (Timken, A)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Claims Consistent With Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision be DISMISSED re 24 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Regarding Initial Scheduling Conference Scheduled for October 2, 2017, and Directing Clerk to Serve a Copy of This Order on the Fresno County Sheriff's Office and the Fresno County Jail Supervisor/Inmate Coordinator signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/26/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 61 Motion for discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/2/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER on Plaintiff's 52 Letter signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Adopting 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/8/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) 30 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint be Denied; ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Strike, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Oral Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/06/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Hearing on Defendant's 30 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/10/17. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Gonzalez, R)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on Plaintiff's Letter 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/12/16. 21-Day Deadline to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. (Gonzalez, R)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Leave to Amend the Complaint; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File Second Amended Complaint Lodged on May26, 2016 22 ; ORDER DENYING Request for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/13/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 17 Motion for Immediate Initiation of Service signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/5/15. (Marrujo, C)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 15 Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/9/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?