October 26, 2021 |
Filing
146
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust the Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
|
October 7, 2021 |
Filing
144
ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 13, 2021 HEARING AND OCTOBER 19, 2021 TRIAL AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS (TWENTY-ONE DAY DEADLINE). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The hearing on the parties' motions in limine and motion to trifurcate set for October 13, 2021 (ECF Nos. 136 , 137 , 138 ), is VACATED. The trial of this matter set for October 19, 2021, and the remaining deadlines in the modified pretrial scheduling order (ECF No. 142 ) are VACATED; and the parties SHALL FILE dispositional documents within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/2021. (Apodaca, P)
|
September 28, 2021 |
Filing
142
ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the hearing on the parties' motions in limine and Defendants' m otion to trifurcate the trial (ECF Nos. 136 , 137 , 138 ) is continued to October 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9. The deadline for all remaining pretrial filings identified in the pretrial scheduling order (ECF No. 133 at 2540) i s continued to close of business on October 13, 2021. The trial date is continued to October 19, 2021, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. If the parties reach a settlement agreement, they shall notify the Court of the settlement immediately. (Gonzales, V)
|
September 8, 2021 |
Filing
135
ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION OF UNDISPUTED EVIDENTIARY ISSUES IN LIEU OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/2021(Hernandez, M)
|
October 30, 2020 |
Filing
127
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL; Pre-Trial Conference:August 27, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9; Trial: October 12, 2021, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2020. (Hernandez, M)
|
October 7, 2020 |
Filing
119
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/2020. (Hernandez, M)
|
April 6, 2020 |
Filing
117
ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT ON DEFENDANTS' PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of Defendants' petition for writ of certiorari within six (6) months o f issuance of this order; and if Defendants' petition for writ of certiorari is denied prior to the expiration of the six (6) month period, the parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the date of denial. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/6/2020. (Apodaca, P)
|
January 21, 2020 |
Filing
114
ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file a joint status report regarding Defendants writ of certiorari on or before April 3, 2020; and Within three (3) days of the date of entry of this order, Mr. Meiselas shall file the appropriate paperwork to appear in this action as counsel for Plaintiff if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/21/2020. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
101
ORDER Disregarding 100 Motion to Proceed IFP and Directing Clerk of Court to Forward Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/05/2016. (Flores, E)
|
October 21, 2016 |
Filing
89
JUDGMENT dated *10/20/16* in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff pursuant to order. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing
88
ORDER and Receipt for Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/2016. (Flores, E)
|
October 14, 2016 |
Filing
80
ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 1 and 9 55 Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
53
ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND BIFURCATING TRIAL FOR PURPOSES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES 45 46 48 [49-50] 52 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
44
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EVIDENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER DENYING 34 DEFENDANT CITY OF BAKERSFIELD AND DEFENDANT AARON STRINGER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant City of Bakersfield and Defendant Aaron Stringers objection to Scott De Foes report is sustained; andDefendant City of Bakersfield and Defendant Aaron Stringers motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 18, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER Vacating March 23, 2016 Hearing; Granting Defendants' 29 Motion to Join Michael Dozer as a Nominal Defendant; and Directing Plaintiff's to Serve Michael Dozer with a Copy of the Summons and Complaint within Twenty Days; ORDER Vacating February 18, 2016 Order Dismissing Michael Dozer from this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/17/2016. (Flores, E)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER Dismissing Defendant Michael Dozer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/17/2016. Michael Dozer (an individual) terminated.(Flores, E)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
27
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MICHAEL DOZER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 4(m) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES. TEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/1/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER Permitting Filing of First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/22/2015. Amended Complaint due by 5/27/2015.(Flores, E)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
21
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing
12
ORDER SETTING MANDATORY Scheduling Conference for 3/3/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|