Taylor v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Delton L. Taylor
Defendant: Harishkumar Patel and Richard Le
Case Number: 1:2014cv01754
Filed: November 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING 83 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/28/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Relief be DISMISSED for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re 9 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/8/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER VACATING 73 Writ of Habeas Corpus Testifacandum for Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/21/18. (Order served on Warden, Litigation Coordinator, & Out to Court.) (Marrujo, C)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/13/18. (Marrujo, C)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TENTATIVE PRETIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/7/2018. (Each party is granted 14 days from the date of this order to file objections to the same. Each party is also granted 7 days thereafter to respond to the other party's objections. If no objections are filed, the order will become final without further order of this court.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 57 Motion to Modify Trial Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/13/2017. Jury Trial set for 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER ADOPTING 48 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDERED that this action shall proceed against Defendants on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment inadequate medical care claims, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/15/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 36 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/02/017. Referred to Judge Drozd. (Flores, E)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/16/2017. (Flores, E)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 31 Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/2/16. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 32 MOTION TO MODIFY 23 SCHEDULING ORDER AS TO DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES. MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/8/2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/6/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 13 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/4/15. (Marrujo, C)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Amended Complaint Forms, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/28/2015. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delton L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harishkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?