Philpott v. King et al
Plaintiff: Steven Philpott
Defendant: Audrey King, Cliff Allenby, Tom Voss, Pam Ahlin and Stephen Mayberg
Case Number: 1:2014cv01766
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Action without Prejudice for Failure to Submit Filing Fee or Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/27/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 5/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To: (1)Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, (2) Direct Clerk's Office To Send Habeas Petition Form, And (3) Require Plaintiff To File Habeas Petition Or Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Within Thirty Days (ECF No. 1 ), Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/10/2015. F&RS's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/27/2015. (Fahrney, E)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER To SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To Obey A Court Order, Failure To File Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, And Failure To Pay Filing Fee (ECF No. 7 ), Fourteen (14) Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/3/2015. Show Cause Response due by 2/19/2015.(Fahrney, E)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-2399) to Fresno (1:14-cv-1766) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/12/14. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpott v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Allenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mayberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?