Cassells v. King et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Cassells
Defendant: Audrey King, Cliff Allenby, Tom Voss and Pam Ahlan
Case Number: 1:2014cv01774
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Voluntary Dismissal of Action,signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/06/2015. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: (1) Dismiss 1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, (2) Direct Clerk's Office to Send Habeas Petition Form, and (3) Require Plaintiff to File Habeas Petition or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal within Thirty Days; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/3/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 2/20/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/19/2014. (Fahrney, E)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-2521 KJN PC) to Fresno (1:14-cv-1774 JLT PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/12/2014; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassells v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cassells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Allenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?