USA v. 39.77 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare Co., et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 39.77 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare County, Randall L. Carroll, Success Development Company, Joyce D. Tzugaris, Carl Adair Brown, Success Mutual Water Company, Success Properties, Chicago Title Company, Harding & Leggett, Inc., Modoc County Title Co., Inc., James L. Holden, Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector, Barbara J Brown and Unknown Owners
Case Number: 1:2014cv01819
Filed: November 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER 103 for FINAL JUDGMENT in EMINENT DOMAIN signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2015. The full and just compensation payable by United States for taking of estates in subject property is $747,500 which sum is all inclusive. Judgment shall be, and is hereby, entered against United States of America in the amount of $747,500. Just compensation has been properly paid and distributed to parties entitled to receive just compensation herein. (Marciel, M)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/15 re: 96 DISMISSING Defendant Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector as Defendant in this action. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate said Defendant from the Off icial Docket of this case; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after this Order is served upon Tulare County, no further documents in this case need to be served upon said Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that said Tulare County may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. IF IS FURTHER ORDERED that other Defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open. Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector terminated. (Meuleman, A)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR DELIVERY OF POSSESSION signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2015. (Zignago, K.)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/15. Chicago Title Company is DISMISSED as a defendant in this action. (Manzer, C)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/30/15. Success Properties terminated. (Manzer, C) Modified on 2/2/2015 (Meuleman, A).
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/21/2015 APPROVING 71 Stipulation and Proposed Order in its entirety; ORDERING the Clerk of Court to distribute as soon as possible, and within thirty (30) days, $747,500.00 by check made payable to "Randall L. Carroll, Trustee under the Randall L. Carroll Separate Property Trust, Established September 15, 2009" and mailed to: Randall L. Carroll, Trustee, 981 W. North Grand Avenue, Porterville, California 93257; D IRECTING the Clerk of Court to enter satisfaction of judgment of record as to the Trustee upon payment of the $747,500.00; ORDERING that all parties be responsible for their own legal fees, costs, and expenses. (cc Financial Fresno, Financial Sacramento) (Michel, G)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER re: signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/9/15 65 ORDERING that Defendant Modoc County Title Co. be DISMISSED as Defendant in this action; FURTHER ORDERING that, after this Order is served upon Modoc County Title, no further documents in this case need to be served upon said Defendant; FURTHER ORDERING that said Modoc County Title may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings; and FURTHER ORDERING that other defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open. (Meuleman, A)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/6/2015 DISMISSING Defendant J. Rand Olson; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to terminate said defendant from the official docket; ORDERING that no further documents be served on Defendant J. Rand Olson; ORDERING that Defendant J. Rand Olson be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. (Michel, G)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/23/14 ORDERING that defendant James L. Holden (Trustee of the Chester M. Mason Family Trust) is DISMISSED from this action. (Kastilahn, A)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/16/14 ORDERING that Defendant Rosedale Water Company (a California corporation) is DISMISSED as Defendant in this action. The Clerk is directed to terminate said Defendant from the Official Docket of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after this Order is served upon ROSEDALE, no further documents in this case need to be served upon said Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that said ROSEDALE may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/14. IT IS ORDERED that JOYCE D. TZUGARIS AKA JOYCE D. KING AKA J.D. TZUGARIS AKA J.D. KING, (hereinafter JOYCE D. TZUGARIS), is dismissed as Defendant in this action. The Cle rk of the Court is directed to terminate said Defendant from the Official Docket of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after this Order is served upon JOYCE D. TZUGARIS, no further documents in this case need to be served upon said Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that said JOYCE D. TZUGARIS may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that other Defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open.(Dillon, M)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/2/2014 ORDERING defendant Tulare County Escrow Co. DISMISSED. (Zignago, K.)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 8 Ex Parte Application for Order for Deposit of Funds in Registry of Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 39.77 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare Co., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn Trinka Ernce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 39.77 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in Tulare County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall L. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce D. Tzugaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Adair Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Mutual Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harding & Leggett, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modoc County Title Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?