Shepherd v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin Shepherd
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01901
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/4/16. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/2/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING Second Settlement Conference Before Magistrate Judge McAuliffe (Stipulation Doc. 50). SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 8/15/2016 at 10:00 AM (instead of 11:00 a.m.) in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Note: additional information has been provided in the Order portion of this document. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/14/2016. (Herman, H)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion For Leave to Amend, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/25/2016. (1. Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is granted, and the second amended complaint is deemed filed and served as of the da te of this order; 2. The prior 15 scheduling order is amended as follows: a. Defendant shall have until 5/20/2016 to propound additional written discovery limited solely to plaintiffs defamation cause of action; b. The deadline to file dispositive motions is continued to 6/6/2016; c. The hearing date for dispositive motions is continued to 7/5/2016; d. The final pretrial conference is continued to 8/29/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; e. The jury trial date is continued to October 25, 2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/4/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint is deemed filed and served as of the date of this Order. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within twenty (20) days of this Order. The plaintiff's 22 motion to file a First Amended Complaint is VACATED from the Court's 9/16/2015 motion calendar. (Zignago, K.)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/8/15. (Kastilahn, A)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for July 22, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8, before Judge McAuliff in Fresno, CA), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/7/2015. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Leila Narvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Shepherd
Represented By: Kurt W. Dreger, NCAED
Represented By: Anthony J. Sperber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?