Leos v. Rasey et al
Plaintiff: James Leos
Defendant: C. Rasey and M. Stonestreet
Case Number: 1:2014cv02029
Filed: December 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2018: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER That Inmate James Leos is No Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/10/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport James Leos, CDCR# V-07456, on July 10, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/22/2018. (Timken, A)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on July 10, 2018 133 , 134 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2018: Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.(Hellings, J)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on July 16, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/18. Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 88 , 120 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/2018: 21-Day Deadline; and The matter is referred back to the magistrate judge. (Hellings, J)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS on Defendants' 88 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting Defendants' Second 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/12/17. Reply Due 10/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 109 Defendant's First Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/2017. Reply due by 10/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 76 , and any objections thereunder are overruled, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 096/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 95 Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting Plaintiff's 96 First Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/9/17. 30-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/7/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' First Request for an Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration Nunc Pro Tunc 77 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/15/17: Deadline EXTENDED to May 18, 2017. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline to June 10, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/24/2017. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Reconsideration with Prejudice, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Adopting 62 Findings and Recommendations on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses re 51 , 52 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/27/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses 52 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 53 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/11/17. (Hellings, J)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 43 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Defendants' 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/16. (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on March 29, 2016 29 , be GRANTED and DENIED re ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/816. Objections to F&R due (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Second Informational ORDER - Notice And Warning Of Requirements For Opposing Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. 29 ), 21-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/2016.(Statement/Opposition Deadline: 4/22/2016) (Fahrney, E)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses With Leave To Amend (Doc. 24 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/24/2016. (Fahrney, E)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Defendants' 26 Motion for a Stay of Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/17/16. (Gonzalez, R)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 18 Request for Screening of the Second Amended Complaint and FINDING Cognizable Claims; Response Due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/26/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leos v. Rasey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rasey
Represented By: Erick J Rhoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stonestreet
Represented By: Erick J Rhoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?