Williams v. Andrade et al
Plaintiff: Gerry Williams
Defendant: J. Andrade, Deathridge, J. Rodriguez, Webster, K. Shuler, M. Black, T. May, W. Oxborrow, J. Wisley, L. Rumbles, A. Silveira and R. Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2014cv02073
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' 22 MOTION to DISMISS be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/17. Referred to Judge Ishii. Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and DISMISSING Defendants May, Silveira, Webster, Andrade and Deathridge signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/21/2016. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants Andrade, Webster, Silveira, May, and Deathridge be Dismissed; Objections Due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 3/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Screening and for Status signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/9/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Finding that Plaintiff has Paid the Filing Fee in Full for this Action; ORDER Vacating 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of February 26, 2015; ORDER for Clerk to Reflect on the Court's Docket Plaintiff's $50.00 Payment Received on February 13, 2015 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/31/2015. (Flores, E)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case For Failure to Obey Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/26/2015, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to pay $50.00 balance owed for filing fees signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/15/2015. (Filing Fee Deadline: 2/17/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full within Thirty Days signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/08/2015. (Case Management Deadline: 2/11/2015) (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Andrade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deathridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Oxborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Rumbles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?