Bates et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bates, Paul Blevins, Michael Blue, Darrell Bradford, Johnny Briones, James Carr, Ricky Carter, Keith Dean, Marco Del Aguila, Vickter Estrada, John Everhart, Antonio Franco, Emmanuel Franco, Michael Frederickson, James Garrett, Kevin Hardin, Clifford Hayter, Sokha Hinn, Jason Hockley, Darnell Hughes, Jose Islas, Jesse Johnson, Johnson Mandaz, Daniel Jones, Mikhiel Lienweber, Jesse Lewelling, Cleofas Lewis, Kevin Lewis, Manning Michael, James McGinley, William Milton, Mack Page, Cedric Parker, Theodore Parker, Manuel Quiroga, Charles Robertson, Richard Robertson, Johnny Sanchez, Tyrone Sanders, Julio Taramona, Danny Terry, Patrick Wallace, Alonzo Williams, Finley Wimberley and Gerald Young
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Jeffrey Beard, Paul Brazelton, Matthew Cate, Scott Frauenheim, James Hartley, Susan L. Hubbard, Deborah Hysen, Felix Igbinosa, Scott Kernan, Chris Meyer, Tanya Rothchild, Teresa Schwartz, Dwight Winslow, Carl Wofford and James A. Yates
Case Number: 1:2014cv02085
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2019. (Timken, A)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re Stipulation to Continue Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/20/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Staying Actions pursuant to the Stipulatlion of the Parties, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/18/16. CASE STAYED. (Verduzco, M)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismisal of Defendants J. Clark Kelso and Robert Sillen signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/01/2016. (Flores, E)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. It is hereby ordered that the time for defendants to file a responsive pleading in this matter is extended to March 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER reassigning case signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/29/2015. New Case Number is 1:14-cv-02085-LJO-SAB.(Lundstrom, T)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to Either File an Executed Notice of Service of Summons or Serve the Complaint within 20 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant J. Clark Kelso signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/23/2015. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Staying Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/22/15. CASE STAYED. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bates
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Blevins
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blue
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bradford
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Briones
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carr
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Carter
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dean
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Del Aguila
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickter Estrada
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Everhart
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Franco
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Franco
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Frederickson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Garrett
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hardin
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Hayter
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sokha Hinn
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hockley
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Hughes
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Islas
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Johnson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Mandaz
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jones
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhiel Lienweber
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lewelling
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleofas Lewis
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lewis
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manning Michael
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGinley
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Milton
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Page
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Parker
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Parker
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Quiroga
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Robertson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Robertson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Sanchez
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Sanders
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Taramona
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Terry
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wallace
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Williams
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finley Wimberley
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Young
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Matthew B. Pavone
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Rothchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?