Aguilar v. Wawona Frozen Foods et al
Plaintiff: Luis Aguilar
Defendant: Wawona Frozen Foods, Wawona Export and Wawona Packing Co. LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00093
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 81 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and 83 Motion for Attorneys' Fees signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/18/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Setting Dates Following Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/23/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 70 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/11/2017. (The hearing for final approval of the proposed settlement is set for 5/16/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 10/21/2016 in which to file their motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/14/2016. (Rooney, M)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadlines While the Parties Continue Settlement Negotiations With the Assistance of the Mediator, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/9/2016. (The following deadlines are extended as follows- Phase I Discovery Completion Date: 8/22/2016; Phase I Expert Witness Disclosures: 8/5/2016; Phase I Supplemental Expert Disclosures: 20 days after expert disclosure; Filing of Motion for Class Certification: 9/2/2016.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 55 Motion for Trial Plan, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/15/2016. (Defendants' motion for an order requiring plaintiffs to submit a detailed trial plan with their motion for class certification is denied at this time without prejudice. The previously noticed 4/19/2016, and continued by stipulation to 6/13/2016, hearing on defendants' motion is vacated.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines While the Parties Attend Mediation; ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/7/2016. (Case schedule modified as follows- 55 Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Submit a Trial Plan previously set for 4/1 9/2016, is CONTINUED to 6/13/2016, at 2:30pm in Courtroom 5 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Phase I Discovery Completion Date: 7/8/2016; Phase I Expert Witness Disclosures: 6/21/2016; Phase I Supplemental Expert Disclosures: 20 days after expert disclosure; Filing of Motion for Class Certification: 7/19/2016.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/26/16 ORDERING that the Phase I Discovery Completion Date is EXTENDED to 05/09/16. (Benson, A)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER for Filing of Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/1/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 32 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/23/2015. (Martinez, A)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Timely File Consent or Decline Form as Ordered by the Court signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/11/2015. Plaintiff's response due within five court days.(Martinez, A)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION for Filing of Amended Complaint; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/30/2015. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. Wawona Frozen Foods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Aguilar
Represented By: Philip A Downey
Represented By: Cory Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawona Frozen Foods
Represented By: Howard A. Sagaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawona Export
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawona Packing Co. LLC
Represented By: Ronald H. Barsamian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?