Ortiz et al v. Tilly's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Herbert Ortiz and Audra Haynes
Defendant: Tilly's, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00108
Filed: January 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/10/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Re: Dispositive Documents After Notice of Settlement (ECF No. 20 ) Dispositive Documents Shall Be Filed Within 60 Days , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/10/2015. (Yu, L)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation to stay matter; Order Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2015. (Status Conference set for 6/11/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng) (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Tilly's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Ortiz
Represented By: Amy R Lovegren-Tipton
Represented By: Lenden Franklin Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Haynes
Represented By: Amy R Lovegren-Tipton
Represented By: Lenden Franklin Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilly's, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Robert Lubeley
Represented By: Emily Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?