Saahdi Coleman v. Figueroa et al
Plaintiff: Saahdi Coleman
Defendant: P. Figueroa and S. Leon
Case Number: 1:2015cv00109
Filed: January 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 74 Request for Certificate of Appealability signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/7/2018: Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Hellings, J)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendant's 56 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/3/18. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within 21-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 44 Plaintiff's Request for a Copy of the Order Requiring Initial Disclosures and Setting an Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER adopting 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 32 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendant's 32 MOTION to DISMISS be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/18/17. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Adopting 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/7/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Finding Cognizable Claim and Dismissing Remaining Claims and Defendants re 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/26/16. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Confirmation of Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISREGARDING 16 Plaintiff's Request for Administrative Remedies to be Deemeed Exhausted signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/31/2015. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saahdi Coleman v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saahdi Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?