Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Scott Butler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv00133
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER as follows: Based upon the parties' Stipulation for the Award and Payment of Equal Access to Justice Act Fees, Costs, and Expenses (ECF No. 29 ), Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EA JA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412, in the amount of SEVEN THOUSAND, TWO HUNDRED DOLLARS ($7,200.00) subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (ECF No. 26 ) is DENIED as moot. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/11/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Final Judgment and ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/28/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the oral argument hearing currently set for 3/8/2017 and CONTINUING it to 3/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/12/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 6/27/2016 for receipt of plaintiff's opening brief, with defendant's opposition due by 7/27/2016, and plaintiff's reply brief by 8/11/2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/27/2016. (Rooney, M)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/27/15. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Butler
Represented By: Geri Nadine Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?