(PC) Neely v. Moss et al
Plaintiff: (PC) Neely and Charles Albert Neely
Defendant: Moss, D. Artis, R. L. Briggs and J.W. Moss
Case Number: 1:2015cv00195
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, with prejudice, for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim; ORDERED that this action count as a strike pursuant to 28:1915 (g) (Strike), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/26/2016. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
January 26, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Dismissing Case (Strike), Terminate Deadlines and Hearings served on Charles Albert Neely. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/17/2015. Amended Complaint due by 1/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form)(Lundstrom, T)
December 17, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend served on Charles Albert Neely. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge *Gary S. Austin* from the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone* for all further proceedings. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge, served on Charles Albert Neely. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2015 Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Charles Albert Neely. (Flores, E)
February 17, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to McFarland Community Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 1577, McFarland, CA 93250 by Charles Albert Neely. (Fahrney, E)
February 17, 2015 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charles Albert Neely. (Fahrney, E)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
February 6, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Charles Albert Neely. (Marrujo, C)
February 5, 2015 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
February 5, 2015 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:15-cv-00305.
February 5, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Charles Albert Neely. (Marrujo, C)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of CA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/3/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) [Transferred from cand on 2/5/2015.]
January 22, 2015 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/2/2015. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015) [Transferred from cand on 2/5/2015.]
January 22, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles Albert Neely. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015) [Transferred from cand on 2/5/2015.]
January 22, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under the Prisoner Civil Rights Act against D. Artis, R. L. Briggs, J.W. Moss (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Charles Albert Neely. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015) [Transferred from cand on 2/5/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Neely v. Moss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (PC) Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Albert Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?