Neely v. Briggs et al
Plaintiff: Charles Albert Neely
Defendant: R. L. Briggs, D. Artis and J.W. Moss
Case Number: 1:2015cv00197
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's 28 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Response and Objections to Defendant's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/16. (Hellings, J)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation 24 , Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Directing Defendant to File a Further Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/11/16. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Defendant's 19 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/1/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of CA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/3/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) [Transferred from cand on 2/5/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neely v. Briggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Albert Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?