United States of America v. Approximately $40,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $40,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2015cv00237
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/11/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Motion Lifting Stay 22 . The Court LIFTS the stay in this case. The Court further ORDERS that it will hold a Scheduling Conference on 4/6/2017, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 3/30/2017. The court VACATES the hearing on said motion set for 2/22/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/14/2017. (Thorp, J)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER to STAY PROCEEDINGS (Doc. 18 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/18/2015. CASE STAYED. (Arellano, S.)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Request for Continuance of Mandatory Scheduling Conference and Filing Deadline for Joint Scheduling Report. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/12/2015, is CONTINUED to 6/30/2015, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 6/23/2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/23/2015. (Timken, A)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Clerk's Issuance Of Warrant For Arrest Of Articles In Rem, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/24/2015. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $40,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Spivak, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $40,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?