Recino v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Roberto R. Recino
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 1:2015cv00362
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that All Doe Defendants be DISMISSED and This Action Closed, Without Prejudice re 30 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Provide Written Notice Identifying Doe Defendants for Service of Process or SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed; Show Cause Response due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Requesting Response Regarding Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum re 46 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/17/18. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of Doe Defendants and dismissal of action 49 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/29/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Provide Written Notice Identifying Doe Defendants for Service of Process or SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed; Show Cause Response due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A SUBPOENA 41 AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT INFORMATION FOR A SUBPOENA signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/22/2017. (Filing Deadline: 7/26/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Court to Compel a Response Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/13/16. (Marrujo, C)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/23/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISCHARGING 28 Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not be Dismissed; ORDER Finding Service of Third Amended Complaint Appropriate as to Plaintiff's Claims Against Unknown Correctional Officers; and ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Substitute Doe Defendant(s) or File Status Report Within Forty-Five (45) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/25/2016. Show Cause Response due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/29/15. (Verduzco, M)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to State a Claim re 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recino v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto R. Recino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?