Ortiz et al v. Alvarez et al
Plaintiff: S. Ortiz, R Villanueva, A Padron, L Ramos, G Sandoval, J Sandoval and E Padron
Defendant: Gerardo Alvarez, Parlier Unified School District, Parlier Unified School District Board of Trustees, Edward Lucero, Israel Lara and Youth Centers of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv00535
Filed: April 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER RULING ON THE PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Doc. Nos. 218 , 219 ) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/18/2019. (Thorp, J)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/05/2019. (Flores, E)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs Alfonso Padron and Elida Padron's 190 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/15/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal 172 , 184 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER for Plaintiff Alfonso Padron to Submit Affidavit Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/24/2018. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 132 , 133 , 134 , 135 , 136 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/21/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER adopting 166 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting Defendants' Motion to enforce Settlement Agreement and denying Defendants' request for monetary sanctions as to Raul Villanueva 161 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Finds and Recommendations that Defendants' 161 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Request for Monetary Sanctions as to Raul Villameuva be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/2/2018. Motion referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 4/17/2018. (Rosales, O)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Terminating Martha Moreno as Plaintiff on the Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/12/2017. (Flores, E)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/15/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE August 2, 2017 Hearing Re Settlement Agreement for Plaintiff Raul Villanueva signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/02/2017. (Flores, E)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference as to Plaintiffs Alsonso Padron and Elida Padron signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/27/2017. Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Flores, E)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Re Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/17: Settlement Conference set for July 26, 2017 at 11:30 a.m., Ctrm 9, before Magistrate Judge Boone. (Hellings, J)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record 100 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/31/17. (Hellings, J)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re Continued Discovery Dates and Expert Designations signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/5/2017. (Valdez, E)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER TERMINATING Juan Sandoval as Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/23/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting Defendant PUSD's 72 Motion to Dismiss the Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action Against PUSD, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/2016. (1. Defendant PUSD's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 72) is granted; 2. The eight c ause of action, appearing in plaintiffs' fourth amended complaint (Doc. No. 67), is DISMISSED as to defendant PUSD only; and 3. The ninth cause of action, appearing in plaintiffs' fourth amended complaint (Doc. No. 67), is DISMISSED as to defendant PUSD only.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/12/2016. In light of the plaintiffs' 52 Statement of Non-Opposition the claims for negligent infliction of emotional distress are DISMISSED with prejudice. The plaintiffs do not address t he YCAs and Laras arguments that the complaint states no claim against them for state-law wrongful termination in violation of public policy. This claim is therefore DISMISSED with leave to amend. The plaintiffs are again reminded of their obligation s under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Complaint's theory of YCA's and Lara's liability as private entities under § 1983 is incoherent. The claims under § 1983 are DISMISSED with leave to amend to clear up this confusio n, if possible in light of the authorities cited above and the requirement that defendants can only be liable under § 1983 for actions undertaken under color of state law. "The 59 Stipulation is APPROVED in part as follows. Because not a ll defendants stipulated to the filing of a Third Amended Complaint, and that pleading was filed without leave of court, it is STRICKEN. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). The plaintiffs are however GRANTED leave to file a fourth amended complaint, which may (1) address the matters discussed above with respect to the YCA's and Lara's motion; and (2) implement the changes made in the stricken third amended complaint with respect to the PUSD defendants. The PUSD motion to dismiss is therefore DENIED AS MOOT, and the PUSD defendants may file a renewed Motion to Dismiss, including to dismiss any claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, once an amended complaint is on file. A Fourth Amended Complaint shall be filed within 14 days of the date this order is filed. (Marciel, M)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/3/15 ORDERING that within seven days of entry of this order, why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for failure to comply with this court's order. (Kastilahn, A)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/26/2015 DISMISSING the plaintiffs' second claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress with leave to amend; DISMISSING the plaintiffs' ninth claim brought under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 wi th leave to amend; DISMISSING the plaintiffs' twelfth claim for wrongful termination in violation of public policy with prejudice as alleged against Mr. Lara; DISMISSING the plaintiffs' twelfth claim for wrongful termination in violation of public policy with leave to amend as alleged against Youth Centers; ORDERING the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days; RESOLVING 5 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 25 Motion to Amend the Complaint as moot. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Alvarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Ortiz
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Villanueva
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Padron
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L Ramos
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Sandoval
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Sandoval
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Padron
Represented By: Alexia D. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Alvarez
Represented By: Leith Bryant Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parlier Unified School District
Represented By: Leith Bryant Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parlier Unified School District Board of Trustees
Represented By: Leith Bryant Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lucero
Represented By: Leith Bryant Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Lara
Represented By: Justin Thomas Campagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youth Centers of America
Represented By: Justin Thomas Campagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?