Williams v. King et al
Plaintiff: Corey Williams
Defendant: Audrey King, Brandon Price, Daniel Meeks, Kiran Hundal, Robert Withrow, Joshua William Phillips, Samantha Amaro, Ejike Nnamah, Janette Mcclain and Alexander Balderaz
Case Number: 1:2015cv00543
Filed: April 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Defendants' 38 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/10/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and WARNING of requirements for opposing Defendant's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 38 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/27/2018. 21-Day filing deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 Defendants' Request to Seal Documents in Accordance With Local Rule 141 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/22/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING 33 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/6/2018. This action shall continue to proceed on plaintiff's Due Process and Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Young, Perez, Deleon and Underwood. (Jessen, A)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCREENING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 , 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/18/17. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case no. is: 1:15-cv-0543-DAD-SKO. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Answer 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Substituting Defendant Kenneth Underwood in Place of John Doe signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2017. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/18/17: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER finding due process and eight amendment claims cognizable against Defendants Young, Perez and DeLeon and dismissing Defendants King and Price and equal protection claims with prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/13/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/10/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Hundal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua William Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Amaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ejike Nnamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janette Mcclain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Balderaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?