Reamel v. Harrington et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Reamel
Defendant: Kelli Harrington, M. Gamboa, F. Munez, J. Keenerisgt, J. Watkins, J. Diaz, H. Flores, J. Gonzales, P. Paprzycki, C. Henderson, F.P. Fields and Jeffrey A. Beard
Case Number: 1:2015cv00553
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Court Grant Defendants J. Gonzales and J. Bugarin's Motion for Summary Judgment 66 ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/24/18. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Extension to Oppose Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 07/26/2018. Opposition due 8/15/2018; Objections to F&R due by 8/29/2018.(Flores, E)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court Dismiss the Case for Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to Defendants' 66 Motion for Summary Judgment, Failure to Prosecute, and Failure to Comply with a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 07/19/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/6/2018.(Flores, E)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Amend Case Caption signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/25/2018. Martinez terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING 63 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS;ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/09/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint be DENIED re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/27/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport inmate, Reamel Curtis for a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison at the U.S. District Court 501 "I" Street, Courtroom No.1, Sacramento, CA on 4/5/2018 at 9:00 am signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADOPTING 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/20/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/9/2018. Settlement Conference set for 4/5/2018 at 09:00 AM at the U.S. District Court in Sacramento, Courtroom 1, before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Jessen, A)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/23/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Third 52 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/16/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 47 Motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/27/2017. Defendants' Filing Deadline for Motion to Compel: 12/13/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 1/19/2018. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/7/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Lundstrom, T)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISCHARGING 37 Order to Show Cause; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Response; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE as to Why Judgment Should Not Be Entered in Favor of Defendants for Failure to Respond to Dispositive Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why he Should Not be Sanctioned for Failure to Appear, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Adopting 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS In Full that this Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Gonzalez and Martinez on Plaintiff's Denial of Access to Courts Claims and that all other Claim and Defendants be Dismissed signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed only against Defendants Gonzalez and Burgarin on Plaintiff's failure to protect claim re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Reamel Curtis ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/28/16. Objections to F&R due by 10/24/2016 (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reamel v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Reamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Munez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Keenerisgt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Paprzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.P. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?