Torres v. Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: Gustavo Torres
Defendant: J. Gutierrez, G. Arrellano, R. Montanez and Allan S. Abrams
Case Number: 1:2015cv00575
Filed: April 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 61 be GRANTED in full ;GRANTING NUNC PRO TUNC TO OCTOBER 7, 2016 59 Motion for Extension re 61 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/24/17. (Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline); (Martin-Gill, S)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Vacating Order 68 ; ORDER Denying Defendants' 58 Motion to Strike; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/03/2017. (Flores, E)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Defendants' 58 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Notice of Intention not to File Exhaustion Motion signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/01/2017. (Flores, E)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Defendants' 53 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/19/16. Dispositive Motions Deadline: 9/9/2016. (Gonzalez, R)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/15/16: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying 42 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/1/16. (Verduzco, M)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 44 Motion in Limine without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 05/02/2016. (Flores, E)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/26/16. (Gonzalez, R)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order 37 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Without Prejudice 35 , 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/13/16: Motion for Summary Judgment must be filed by June 13, 2016. (Hellings, J)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 30 Opposition to Answer and Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/05/2016. (Flores, E)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of This Court's Expedited Trial Setting Procedures Upon Consent of All Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/13/2016. (Jessen, A)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Defendants' 22 Ex Parte Request for Leave to File Pre-Answer Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/30/2015. (Flores, E)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Dismissing Certain Defendants and Claims for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/18/15. Allan S. Abrams (Dr. ) and J. Gutierrez (Acting Warden) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/17/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Gutierrez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Arrellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan S. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?